The Ohio National Life Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: The Ohio National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Debra L. Anderson and Douglas Anderson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00029
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate Of Service - Rule 26 by Attorney Barry D. Geweke on behalf of Defendant Debra L. Anderson.(Geweke, Barry)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint And Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Douglas Anderson regarding Complaint, #1 filed by The Ohio National Life Insurance Company by Debra L. Anderson (Geweke, Barry)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kathleen K. Rockey on behalf of Defendant Douglas Anderson (Rockey, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Debra L. Anderson. Waiver sent on 1/24/2020. (Geweke, Barry)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas Anderson. Waiver sent on 1/22/2020. (Janes, Sara)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Receipt - Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $67,733.49 regarding Order, #6 . This entry corrects the text receipt entry filed on 1/28/2020. (LRM)
January 28, 2020 TEXT RECEIPT number 8054998, in the amount of $ 67,733.49 by Plaintiff The Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (LRM)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff Ohio National Life Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to Deposit Its Contractual Liability, Filing #3 , is granted. Plaintiff may deposit a check in the amount of $67,733.49 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2041 and NECivR 67.1. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (E-mailed to Finance)(LKO)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Contractual Liability #3 by Attorney Sara G. Janes on behalf of Plaintiff The Ohio National Life Insurance Company.(Janes, Sara)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Deposit its Admitted Contractual Liability by Attorney Sara G. Janes on behalf of Plaintiff The Ohio National Life Insurance Company.(Janes, Sara)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Ohio National Financial Services, Inc. for The Ohio National Life Insurance Company. by Attorney Sara G. Janes on behalf of Plaintiffs The Ohio National Life Insurance Company, Ohio National Financial Services, Inc..(Janes, Sara)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Debra L. Anderson, Douglas Anderson ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4094339), by Attorney Sara G. Janes on behalf of The Ohio National Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Janes, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ohio National Life Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sara G. Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?