Scholl et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Scholl and Kevin Scholl
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00033
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 11/2/20. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on August 10, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rezac, Rex)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/25/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI19-5181 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4095005) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Rex A. Rezac, #3 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholl et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Scholl
Represented By: P. Shawn McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Scholl
Represented By: P. Shawn McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?