Ashford et al v. Hendrix et al
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford and Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO
Defendant: State of Nebraska, John Does, 1-100, Marcena Hendrix, Douglas County and Jane Does, 1-100
Case Number: 8:2020cv00036
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Filing No. #14 ) is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #19 by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Marcena Hendrix, State of Nebraska.(Post, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #19 by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Marcena Hendrix, State of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan S. Post, #2 Exhibit (Complaint in CI 19-9165), #3 Exhibit (Complaint for Writ of Mandamus in S-20-64), #4 Exhibit (Order denying Complaint for Writ of Mandamus in S-20-64))(Post, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Marcena Hendrix, State of Nebraska.(Post, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Douglas County Answer #14 by Attorney Timothy K. Dolan on behalf of Defendant Douglas County.(Dolan, Timothy)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE OF INCORRECT EVENT used when filing the Brief #15 and Index of Evidence #16 by Deputy Clerk. In the future, use the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Brief and Index. (LKO)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 Index of Evidence Douglas County Answer by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Ashford, Timothy) Modified on 2/26/2020 to reflect index of evidence rather than motion per MDN chambers (LKO).
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 Brief Douglas County Answer by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO.(Ashford, Timothy) Modified on 2/26/2020 to reflect brief instead of motion per MDN Chambers (LKO).
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Douglas County Answer by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford.(Ashford, Timothy)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. For good cause shown, defendants Marcena Hendrix and the State of Nebraska shall have an extension of time to March 6, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Marcena Hendrix, State of Nebraska.(Post, Ryan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant County of Douglas Nebraska's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Douglas County (Dolan, Timothy)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendants Douglas County, Marcena Hendrix in her individual capacity, Marcena Hendrix in her official capacity, and State of Nebraska. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Douglas County regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Marcena Hendrix, official regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Marcena Hendrix individual regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Douglas County regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Marcena Hendrix official regarding Summons Requested #2 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Marcena Hendrix individual regarding Complaint, #1 . (Ashford, Timothy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas County, Marcena Hendrix, Jane Does, 1-100, John Does, 1-100, and State of Nebraska; 4 Blank Summons(es) given to the plaintiff, with receipt number 8054927, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of Timothy L. Ashford and Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford et al v. Hendrix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcena Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does, 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?