Duff v. Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Linda Duff
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00098
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #6 Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Scott D. Hofer on behalf of Defendant Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company.(Hofer, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Edward M. Spellman on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Duff.(Spellman, Edward)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Angela Probasco is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant and shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Angela Probasco on behalf of Defendant Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company.(Probasco, Angela)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Attorney Angela Probasco on behalf of Defendant Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company.(Probasco, Angela)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Angela Probasco on behalf of Defendant Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company.(Probasco, Angela)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Scott D. Hofer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Edward M. Spellman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. by Attorney Angela Probasco on behalf of Defendants Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb Limited, Federal Insurance Company, Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc..(Probasco, Angela)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Linda Duff from Douglas County District Court, Case number D01CI200001019 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4130727) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Angela Probasco on behalf of Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons issued to Chubb, #3 Exhibit C - Return/Alias Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Praecipe for Summons on Chubb, #5 Exhibit E - Case summary of state court action as of 3-13-20)(Probasco, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duff v. Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Probasco
Represented By: Scott D. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Duff
Represented By: Edward M. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?