De Jesus Herrera v. Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Teresa De Jesus Herrera
Defendant: The Physician Network and Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00099
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate /Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures and Disclosures of Nonexpert Witnesses by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Teresa De Jesus Herrera.(Neary, Kathleen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Service of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Attorney Meghan Hanson on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, The Physician Network.(Hanson, Meghan)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in the Rule 26(f) Meeting Report (Filing No. #19 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is November 20, 2020. A status conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the pretrial conference and trial dates, and settlement status will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on December 4, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
April 29, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Teresa De Jesus Herrera.(Neary, Kathleen)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend. The Deadline to File the Rule 26(f) Report and to Serve Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures is extended to May 1, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File the Rule 26(f) Report and to Serve Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Attorney Kathleen M. Neary on behalf of Plaintiff Teresa De Jesus Herrera.(Neary, Kathleen)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/20/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, The Physician Network (Hanson, Meghan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #12 for attorney Christopher L. Johnson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Christopher L. Johnson Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4133627 by Attorney Christopher L. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, The Physician Network.(Johnson, Christopher)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christopher L. Johnson has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Meghan Hanson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER regarding duplicate Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Matthew V. Rusch, receipt number ANEDC-4131040. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4132515 by Attorney Meghan Hanson on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, The Physician Network.(Hanson, Meghan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent CommonSpirit Health for The Physician Network. by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Defendants The Physician Network, CommonSpirit Health.(Rusch, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent CommonSpirit Health for Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC. by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Defendants Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, CommonSpirit Health.(Rusch, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Meghan Hanson has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Physician Network. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Teresa De Jesus Herrera from Saline County District Court, Case number CI 20-24 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4131079) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC, The Physician Network (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - District Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rusch, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus Herrera v. Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa De Jesus Herrera
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Physician Network
Represented By: Matthew V. Rusch
Represented By: Meghan Hanson
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Physician Network, LLC
Represented By: Matthew V. Rusch
Represented By: Meghan Hanson
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?