Diers v. Economy Premier Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Charlie Diers
Defendant: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00144
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER - Upon the request of the parties, the deadline for the Rule 26(f) report and mandatory disclosures will be reset, if necessary, following a ruling on the Motion to Remand #9 .Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 INDEX in support of Brief #14 by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendant Economy Premier Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Keith, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #9 by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendant Economy Premier Assurance Company.(Keith, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT TO AUTHENTICATE DOCUMENTS regarding Index #12 by Attorney Thomas B. Thomsen on behalf of Plaintiff Charlie Diers.(Thomsen, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 INDEX in support of Brief #11 by Attorney Thomas B. Thomsen on behalf of Plaintiff Charlie Diers.(Thomsen, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #9 by Attorney Thomas B. Thomsen on behalf of Plaintiff Charlie Diers.(Thomsen, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of regarding MOTION to Remand #9 by Attorney Thomas B. Thomsen on behalf of Plaintiff Charlie Diers (Thomsen, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Thomas B. Thomsen on behalf of Plaintiff Charlie Diers.(Thomsen, Thomas)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Offer to Confess Judgment by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendant Economy Premier Assurance Company (Keith, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/22/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 by Economy Premier Assurance Company (Keith, Robert)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Economy Fire & Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Economy Fire & Casualty Company for Economy Premier Assurance Company. by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendants Economy Premier Assurance Company, Economy Fire & Casualty Company, Economy Fire & Casualty Company, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife, Inc., MetLife, Inc..(Keith, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Economy Premier Assurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Charlie Diers from District Court of Dodge County, NE, Case number CI 20-26 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4147135) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Economy Premier Assurance Company d/b/a MetLife Auto & Home (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Praecipe, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Service of Process, #5 Exhibit E - Mot to Change Def, #6 Exhibit F - Order, #7 Exhibit G - Amended Complaint)(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diers v. Economy Premier Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Premier Assurance Company
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Diers
Represented By: Thomas B. Thomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?