Cruise v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Cruise
Defendant: TeeSnap, LLC and Allegiant Air, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00151
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Allegiant Travel Company for TeeSnap, LLC. by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendants TeeSnap, LLC, Allegiant Travel Company.(Gandy, Meaghan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC.(Gandy, Meaghan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand Answer to Amended Complaint Filing No. 011 by Allegiant Air, LLC, TeeSnap, LLC (Gandy, Meaghan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Attorney Justin W. High on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Cruise.(High, Justin) Modified on 6/1/2020 (LRH).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by May 28, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE To Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC.(Gandy, Meaghan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Complaint by Attorney Justin W. High on behalf of Plaintiff Benjamin Cruise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(High, Justin)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Allegiant Travel Company for Allegiant Air, LLC. by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendants Allegiant Air, LLC, Allegiant Travel Company.(Gandy, Meaghan)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Allegiant Air, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 29, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading or to File Answer by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC.(Gandy, Meaghan)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant TeeSnap, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Allegiant Air, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Benjamin Cruise from DISTRICT COURT OF DOUGLAS COUNTY, NEBRASKA, Case number CI 20-1187 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4150082) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Allegiant Air, LLC d/b/a TeeSnap (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gandy, Meaghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruise v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TeeSnap, LLC
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Represented By: Meaghan M. Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Air, LLC
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Represented By: Meaghan M. Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Cruise
Represented By: Justin W. High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?