Olona v. NDCS et al
Case Number: 8:2020cv00171
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without furt her notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 29, 2020: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff is advised that his payment of his initial partial filing fee of $0.06 is due by June 19, 2020 unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.06 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response t o a writ ten motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs in stitution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 19, 2020: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filingfee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in it s normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olona v. NDCS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?