Barnhill v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Carolyn Barnhill
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00182
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-21720. Original electronic file received.
May 11, 2020 Filing 52 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 - ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 02 - ECF 184 - Stipulation for Production of Docs and ESI, #3 Exhibit 03 - ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit 04 - ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit 05 - ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit 06 - ECF 8025 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 7 Cases, #7 Exhibit 07 - ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #8 Exhibit 08 - ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #9 Exhibit 09 - ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #10 Exhibit 10 - ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #11 Exhibit 11 - ECF 8315 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #12 Exhibit 12 - ECF 8364 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Badylak, #13 Exhibit 13 - ECF 4831 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #14 Exhibit 14 - ECF 4832 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE Carabello, #15 Exhibit 15 - ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #16 Exhibit 16 - ECF 4974 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #17 Exhibit 17 - ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #18 Exhibit 18 - ECF 5030 - Pltf_s Reply in BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #19 Exhibit 19 - ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Caraballo, #20 Exhibit 20 - ECF 8319 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Caraballo, #21 Exhibit 21 - ECF 8320 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Caraballo, #22 Exhibit 22 - ECF 8373 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Caraballo, #23 Exhibit 23 - ECF 8375 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Caraballo, #24 Exhibit 24 - ECF 4829 - Pltf_s Combined Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Goldberg, #25 Exhibit 25 - ECF 4980 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Goldberg, #26 Exhibit 26 - ECF 5036 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s Combined MTE Goldberg, #27 Exhibit 27 - ECF 6043 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Goldberg, #28 Exhibit 28 - ECF 8322 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Goldberg, #29 Exhibit 29 - ECF 8367 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Goldberg, #30 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo in Support of Their MTE Little - Part 1, #31 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Exh 1 - Part 2, #32 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Exh 2 - Part 3, #33 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Exh 3 - Part 4, #34 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Exh 4 - Part 5, #35 Exhibit 30 - ECF 4825 - Exh 5 - Part 6, #36 Exhibit 31 - ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #37 Exhibit 32 - ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #38 Exhibit 33 - ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #39 Exhibit 34 - ECF 8316 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #40 Exhibit 35 - ECF 8362 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Little, #41 Exhibit 36 - ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #42 Exhibit 37 - ECF 7004 - Pltf_s Combined MTE and Memo Spiegelberg, #43 Exhibit 38 - ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #44 Exhibit 39 - ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #45 Exhibit 40 - ECF 8317 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #46 Exhibit 41 - ECF 8377 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Spiegelberg, #47 Exhibit 42 - ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support to Exclude Blaivas, #48 Exhibit 43 - ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #49 Exhibit 44 - ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #50 Exhibit 45 - ECF 8339 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, #51 Exhibit 46 - ECF 8351 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Blaivas, #52 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support - Part 1, #53 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh A - Part 2, #54 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh B - Part 3, #55 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh C - Part 4, #56 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh D -- Part 5, #57 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh E - Part 6, #58 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh F - Part 7, #59 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh G - Part 8, #60 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh H - Part 9, #61 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh I - Part 10, #62 Exhibit 47 - ECF 4804 - Exh J - Part 11, #63 Exhibit 48 - ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #64 Exhibit 49 - ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #65 Exhibit 50 - ECF 8331 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #66 Exhibit 51 - ECF 8354 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Margolis, #67 Exhibit 52 - ECF 8330 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #68 Exhibit 53 - ECF 8365 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Mays, #69 Exhibit 54 - ECF 8384 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Mays, #70 Exhibit 55 - ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #71 Exhibit 56 - ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #72 Exhibit 57 - ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #73 Exhibit 58 - ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #74 Exhibit 59 - ECF 8336 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #75 Exhibit 60 - ECF 8356 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #76 Exhibit 61 - ECF 8381 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of its MTE Pence, #77 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig and Memo in Support - Part 1, #78 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh A - Part 2, #79 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh B1 - Part 3, #80 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh B2 - Part 4, #81 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh B3 - Part 5, #82 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh B4 - Part 6, #83 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh C - Part 7, #84 Exhibit 62 - ECF 8084 - Exh D - Part 8, #85 Exhibit 63 - ECF 4813 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #86 Exhibit 64 - ECF 4957 - Pltf's Opposition to BSC's MTE Rosenzweig, #87 Exhibit 65 - ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Rosenzweig, #88 Exhibit 66 - ECF 8328 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Rosenzweig, #89 Exhibit 67 - ECF 8357 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #90 Exhibit 68 - ECF 8382 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #91 Exhibit 69 - ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/28/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY by Carolyn Barnhill to #48 Response In Opposition (Faes, Andrew) (Modified on 11/26/2019 to convert event to reply) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY by Boston Scientific Corporation to #47 Response in Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 11/23/2019 to remove link to #44 motion, add link to #47 response, and convert event to a reply) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE by Boston Scientific Corporation in opposition to #45 MOTION by Carolyn Barnhill to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions and Testimony of Roger P. Goldberg, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Carolyn Barnhill in opposition to #44 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Carolyn Barnhill in support of #45 MOTION by Carolyn Barnhill to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions and Testimony of Roger P. Goldberg, M.D. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION by Carolyn Barnhill to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions and Testimony of Roger P. Goldberg, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dawsyn Barnhill on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Ceynna Barnhill on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Daylon Barnhill on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Karen Brinker on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Martin Miksch on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Barnhill for Supplemental Exhibit C to the Rule 26 Expert Report of Bruce Rosenzweig, MD. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Carolyn Barnhill in opposition to #34 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on 10/17/2019 at 9:00 am (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on 10/17/2019 at 9:00 am (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Barnhill for Plaintiff's Designation and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Carolyn Barnhill of Dr. Jill Fish, M.D. on August 7, 2019 at 8:00 a.m. CDT (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Jill Fish on August 7, 2019 at 8:00 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Barnhill for Responses and Objections to First Request for Production of Documents, and Answers and Objections to Defendant's First Interrogatories. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Carolyn Barnhills First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Defendant. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Carolyn Barnhill in opposition to #26 Second Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Carolyn Barnhill (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Jill Fish on August 7, 2019 at 8:00 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 18, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Emily Kean Puccioni on July 19, 2019 at 8:30 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Carolyn Barnhill to #21 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Barnhill for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Defendant. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Carolyn Barnhill in opposition to #15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew N. Faes on behalf of Carolyn Barnhill. (Faes, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Emily Kean-Puccioni on July 30, 2019 at 10 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Jill Fish on July 29, 2019 at 10 am (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Carolyn Barnhill on July 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Carolyn Barnhill. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 208 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 7 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibits A and B are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibits A and B become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/03/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 7 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6384 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Carolyn Barnhill. (Kuntz, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 23, 2013 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 9/11/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 23, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
September 19, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 51 (Order re: Bellwether Case Selection) entered on 08/07/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2602842. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhill v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Barnhill
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Kuntz
Represented By: Andrew N. Faes
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?