Med-Den Funding, LLC v. B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Med-Den Funding, LLC
Defendant: B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00223
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Brief in Support of its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit with Exhibits Supporting Brief in Support of Opposition of Motion to Dismiss)(Mitchell, Jason)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Seal and Strike. Plaintiff's index of evidence at Filing No. 12 shall be stricken and sealed as it contains confidential information. Plaintiff is granted leave to re-file a redacted copy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to file under Seal Motion to Strike, and Motion for Leave to refile Redacted Affidavit by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender Proposed Index of Evidence, #2 Submission From Sender Proposed Redacted Affidavit)(Mitchell, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Mitchell, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc., by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Med-Den Funding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits attached to Amended Complaint)(Mitchell, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 *STRICKEN* INDEX in support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brent Corbin) THIS DOCKET PDF DOCUMENT IS SEALED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT AND/OR LEGAL AUTHORITY GOVERNING SEALED FILINGS. ACCESS IS LIMITED ONLY TO THE COURT. (Mitchell, Jason) Modified on 7/30/2020 to strike and seal per Text Order 16 (LKO).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Unopposed). Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint [10-1] on or before August 3, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Proposed Amended Complaint)(Mitchell, Jason)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Armand Tinkerian on behalf of Defendant B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc..(Tinkerian, Armand)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc. on 6/15/2020. (Mitchell, Jason)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent NexGen Proceed, LLC, Corporate Parent NexGen Proceed, LLC for Med-Den Funding, LLC. by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiffs Med-Den Funding, LLC, NexGen Proceed, LLC, NexGen Proceed, LLC.(Mitchell, Jason)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate NexGen Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate NexGen Ventures, LLC for Med-Den Funding, LLC. by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Plaintiffs Med-Den Funding, LLC, NexGen Ventures, LLC, NexGen Ventures, LLC.(Mitchell, Jason)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to B. Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Mitchell, Jason)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Med-Den Funding LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4174342), by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Med-Den Funding LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits attached to Complaint)(Mitchell, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Med-Den Funding, LLC v. B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med-Den Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Grigorovich D.D.S., Inc.
Represented By: Armand Tinkerian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?