RIGI Hospitality LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: RIGI Hospitality
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00234
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Rule 26(A)(1) by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff RIGI Hospitality.(Martin, Craig)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due February 1, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on February 3, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Amguard Insurance Company.(Rawl, A.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff RIGI Hospitality.(Martin, Craig)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/5/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Amguard Insurance Company (Greene, Earl)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate JudgeSusan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on its own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the docket in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The clerk shall refer the file to the Chief Judge for reassignment to a different magistrate judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 /s/Criag F. Martin by Attorney Craig F. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff RIGI Hospitality.(Martin, Craig)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Amguard Insurance Company. by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Inc..(Greene, Earl)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff RIGI Hospitality. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Amguard Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against RIGI Hospitality from District Court of Hall County, Case number CI 20-112 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4179304) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Amguard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Rawl, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIGI Hospitality LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIGI Hospitality
Represented By: Craig F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?