Saylor v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: James M. Saylor
Defendant: State of Nebraska and NDCS
Case Number: 8:2020cv00264
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Saylor.(TCL)
July 20, 2020 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of James M. Saylor on 07/20/2020. Receipt number 8056950, in the amount of $ 400.00. (LRM)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's correspondence, construed as a motion for clarification (filing #7 ), is granted consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Address Change and MOTION for Clarification on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Saylor. (TCL)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 5, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (TCL)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Saylor.(TCL)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION on behalf of Plaintiff James M. Saylor.(TCL) Modified on 7/6/2020 to correct filed dated. (TCL).
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NDCS, State of Nebraska. No Summons issued, filed on behalf of plaintiff James M. Saylor. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saylor v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?