EFGroupATL, LLC v. Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EFGROUPATL, LLC
Defendant: Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC
Garnishee: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00286
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 INDEX in support of Brief #15 by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Garnishee Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keith, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to Application to Determine Garnishee Liability by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Garnishee Continental Casualty Company.(Keith, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney Leland H. Jones, IV. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4218692 by Attorney Leland H. Jones, IV on behalf of Garnishee Continental Casualty Company.(Jones, Leland)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Stipulation - The deadline for Continental Casualty Company to file a response to EFGroupATL, LLC's "Motion for Order Determining Garnishee Liability" (Filing No. 7) is September 11, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION to Enlarge Opposition Deadline by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Garnishee Continental Casualty Company.(Keith, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Garnishees Continental Casualty Company, The Continental Corporation, The Continental Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation, Loews Corporation, Loews Corporation.(Keith, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 INDEX in support of MOTION for Order Determining Garnishee Liability #7 by Attorney Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Plaintiff EFGroupATL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael T. Eversden)(Eversden, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Order Determining Garnishee Liability #7 by Attorney Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Plaintiff EFGroupATL, LLC.(Eversden, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Order Determining Garnishee Liability by Attorney Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Plaintiff EFGroupATL, LLC.(Eversden, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MKR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff EFGROUPATL, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MKR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Garnishee Continental Casualty Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MKR)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Amended) against EFGROUPATL, LLC, Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, NE, Case number CI 19-6009 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Continental Casualty Company(Keith, Robert)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against EFGROUPATL, LLC, Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, NE, Case number CI 19-6009 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4198699) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Continental Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EFGroupATL, LLC v. Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Represented By: Leland H. Jones, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFGROUPATL, LLC
Represented By: Nicole K. Griffard
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Represented By: Brian T. McKernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat Fit Go Healthy Foods, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Likes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?