Peterson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Troy W. Peterson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00293
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Troy W. Peterson.(LeNeave, Randal)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Lamson, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Lamson, William)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 7/27/2020. (LeNeave, Randal)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (LeNeave, Randal)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4202334), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Troy Peterson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy W. Peterson
Represented By: Jayson D. Nelson
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?