Stanko v. Brewer
Plaintiff: Rudy Stanko
Defendant: Jeff Brewer
Case Number: 8:2020cv00302
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
2 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint #14 by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Keith, Robert)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to OBJECTION #13 by Attorney Alexis M. Wright on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Wright, Alexis)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Jeff Brewer filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Rudy Stanko. (LKO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Attachment) (LKO).
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 OBJECTION and APPEAL Findings and Recommendation and Order from Magistrate to an Article III Judge on behalf of Plaintiff Rudy Stanko. (LKO)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #4 by Attorney Alexis M. Wright on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Wright, Alexis)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, Senior United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), that plaintiff's motion to remand (Filing No. #9 ) be denied. The parties are notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's "Objection To Removal and Removal Pleading In WRONG VENUE & Vicinage," (Filing No. #7 ), is denied. As required under this court's local rules, Plaintiff shall promptly inform the court of any address changes. The failure to do so may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Dismiss #4 filed by Plaintiff Rudy Stanko. (Copy mailed to plaintiff as requested)(JAB)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Remand on behalf of Plaintiff Rudy Stanko. (Copy returned to plaintiff)(LAC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Rudy Stanko at the Scottsbluff County Jail regarding Assignment of Judges 2 and Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01 #3 . Mail not resent no forwarding address. (LKO)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Removal and Removal Pleading in Wrong Venue and Vicinage on behalf of Plaintiff Rudy Stanko.(MKR)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #4 (Amended) by Attorney Alexis M. Wright on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Wright, Alexis) Modified on 8/12/2020 to reflect document is "in support of" motion #4 . (JAB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #4 by Attorney Alexis M. Wright on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Wright, Alexis)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Alexis M. Wright on behalf of Defendant Jeff Brewer.(Wright, Alexis)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CS) Modified on 8/12/2020 to add copy mailed to new address for plaintiff. (JAB)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Rudy Stanko from District Court of Sheridan County, NE, Case number CI 20-31 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4206364) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Jeff Brewer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanko v. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Brewer
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Represented By: Alexis M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Stanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?