Ollie et al v. Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Ollie and Ryan E. Ollie
Defendant: The Nebraska Methodist Hospital and Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. doing business as Methodist Health System
Case Number: 8:2020cv00330
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
2 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/13/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital (Welch, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendant The Nebraska Methodist Hospital.(Welch, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc..(Welch, David)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to the unexpected and untimely death of Senior U.S. District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, this case is reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. The assigned magistrate judge remains the same for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard.(DKM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Nebraska Methodist Hospital. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants' deadline to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to October 23, 2020. Defendants' motion at Filing No. #10 appears to be a duplicate of Filing No. #11 and is therefore denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital.(Welch, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital.(Welch, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., The Nebraska Methodist Hospital (Welch, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Nebraska Methodist health System defendant Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. on 9/3/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon The Nebraska Methodist Hospital defendant The Nebraska Methodist Hospital on 9/3/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Nebraska Methodist Health System defendant Ryan E. Ollie on 9/3/2020; Tammy S. Ollie on 9/3/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc., and The Nebraska Methodist Hospital. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to The Nebraska Methodist Hospital regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Nebraska Methodist Health System, inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4218642), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Tammy S Ollie, Ryan E Ollie(Cullan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollie et al v. Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Ollie
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan E. Ollie
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nebraska Methodist Hospital
Represented By: David L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Methodist Health System, Inc. doing business as Methodist Health System
Represented By: David L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?