Langner v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Vicki Langner
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00349
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER- Within forty-five (45) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of court, together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The clerk of court is directed to terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set in this case. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 12/7/2020.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER: On the Courts own motion, a status conference to discuss pretrial conference and trial setting will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on 10/22/2020 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Case conference instructions are found at Filing No. #64 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis.(RMW)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that defendant Boston Scientific Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations (Filing No. #25 ) is denied. Defendant Boston Scientific's Motion for Summary Judgment on the merits (Filing No. #26 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff Vicki Langner also concedes her claims for manufacturing defect in strict products liability, breach of implied warranty, and fraudulent concealment in her brief. These claims are dismissed. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
September 15, 2020 Filing 62 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #60 for attorney Andrew J. Cross. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 15, 2020 Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #59 for attorney Jeffrey J. Lowe. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 15, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4237282 by Attorney Andrew J. Cross on behalf of Plaintiff Vicki Langner.(Cross, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4237272 by Attorney Jeffrey J. Lowe on behalf of Plaintiff Vicki Langner.(Lowe, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #55 for attorney Sarah Shoemake Doles. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 57 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #54 for attorney Scholastica Baker. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #53 for attorney Mark J. Winebrenner. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4233106 by Attorney Sarah Shoemake Doles on behalf of Plaintiff Vicki Langner.(Doles, Sarah)
September 8, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4232722 by Attorney Scholastica Baker on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Baker, Scholastica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4232712 by Attorney Mark J. Winebrenner on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Winebrenner, Mark)
September 8, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Krause, Ronald)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jon A. Strongman, James H. Keale, Michael A. Tanenbaum, and Kevin L. Morrow are terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 2, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation.(Krause, Ronald)
September 2, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel L. Willis on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (Willis, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David A. Blagg on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (Blagg, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation (Krause, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kevin L. Morrow has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael A. Tanenbaum has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jon A. Strongman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James H. Keale has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sarah Shoemake Doles has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jeffrey J. Lowe has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew J. Cross has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MLF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00712. Original electronic file received.
August 26, 2020 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 7960 - Joint Venue Recommendations, #8 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #9 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 8078 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Green, #15 Exhibit ECF 1010 - WAVE 1 and 2 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Green, #16 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX A, #17 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX B, #18 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX C, #19 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX D, #20 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX E, #21 Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX F, #22 Exhibit ECF 1018 - BSC PTO-119 - Order re Pending Daubert Motions Filed in MDL, #23 Exhibit ECF 8139 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Green, #24 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #27 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #28 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #29 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #30 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #31 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #32 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #33 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #34 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #35 Exhibit ECF 8074 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Rosenblatt, #36 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #37 Exhibit ECF 8140 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Rosenblatt, #38 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #39 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #40 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #41 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #42 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #43 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #44 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #45 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #46 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #47 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #48 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #49 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #50 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #51 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #52 Exhibit ECF 8085 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, #53 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #54 Exhibit ECF 8106 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Blaivas, #55 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #56 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #57 Exhibit ECF 8080 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Iakovlev, #58 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #59 Exhibit ECF 8109 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Iakovlev, #60 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #61 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A1, #62 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh A2, #63 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh B, #64 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh D, #65 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Exh E, #66 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Iakovlev, #67 Exhibit ECF 8087 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #68 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #69 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #70 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #71 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #72 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #73 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #74 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #75 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #76 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #77 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #78 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #79 Exhibit ECF 8110 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Margolis, #80 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #81 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #82 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #83 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of MTE Mays, #84 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #85 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #86 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #87 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #88 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #89 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #90 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #91 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #92 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #93 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #94 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #95 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #96 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #97 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #98 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #99 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #100 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #101 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #102 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #103 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #104 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #105 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #106 Exhibit ECF 8084 - BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #107 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh A, #108 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B1, #109 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B2, #110 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B3, #111 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh B4, #112 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh C, #113 Exhibit ECF 8084 - Exh D, #114 Exhibit ECF 8117 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #115 Exhibit ECF 8164 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #116 Exhibit ECF 6039 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Rosenzweig, #117 Exhibit ECF 8086 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Trepeta, #118 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC_s MTE Trepeta and Memo in Support, #119 Exhibit ECF 8113 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Trepeta, #120 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, #121 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Trepeta, #122 Exhibit ECF 8083 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Veronikis, #123 Exhibit ECF 4807 - BSC_s MTE and Memo re Veronikis, #124 Exhibit ECF 8116 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Veronikis, #125 Exhibit ECF 4964 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opp to MTE Veronikis, #126 Exhibit ECF 6051 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Veronikis, #127 Exhibit ECF 67 - ALLEN - BSC_s Memo in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Green, #128 Exhibit ECF 92 - FOWLER - Pltfs Reply in Support of MTE Green, #129 Exhibit ECF 115 - Fowler - Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions), #130 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #131 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #132 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #133 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #134 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Kevin Lloyd Morrow updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Morrow, Kevin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Vicki Langner of Peter L. Rosenblatt, M.D. on 9/10/2019 at 3:00 p.m. EST (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Vicki Langner of Peter L. Rosenblatt, M.D. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Dionysios Veronikis on August 25, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Richard Trepeta on June 20, 2019 at 6:00 p.m. (MST) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Vicki Langner in opposition to #26 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Vicki Langner in opposition to #25 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Richard Trepeta on June 20, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (MST) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Langner for Rule 26 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Richard Trepeta. (Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Cancellation of Deposition of Dr. Ekene Enemchukwu by Vicki Langner (Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Vicki Langner of Dr. Ekene Enemchukwu on 4/30/2019 at 2:30 p.m. (Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Langner for Rule 26(a)(1) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports. (Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Michael Langner on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Vicki Langner on April 11, 2019 at 10:00 am. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Vicki Langner on April 11, 2019 at 10:00 am. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kevin Lloyd Morrow on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Morrow, Kevin) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Emily Kean on March 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Langner for Responses to Defendant's Requests for Production and Answers to Defendant's Interrogatories. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Responses to Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicki Langner for Requests for Admission, Requests for Production and Interrogatories. (Lowe, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Vicki Langner on January 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Shlomo Raz on January 7, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Emily Kean Puccioni on January 31, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Plaintiff Fact Sheet Deficiency Letter. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 179 (Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund - Boston Scientific Corp. & The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, PC.) entered on 04/17/2018 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6425952. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langner v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Kevin L. Morrow
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Scholastica Baker
Represented By: Daniel L. Willis
Represented By: David A. Blagg
Represented By: Mark J. Winebrenner
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Langner
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Lowe
Represented By: Andrew J. Cross
Represented By: Sarah Shoemake Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?