Olson, II et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Stephen G Olson, II, Lisa Olson and Stephen G. Olson, II
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00358
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is July 16, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on July 16, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(1) by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiffs Lisa Olson, Stephen G. Olson, II.(Saathoff, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Rezac, Rex)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/9/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Jury Demand and ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-3987 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4231099) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Roper, #3 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson, II et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G Olson, II
Represented By: Donald E. Loudner, III
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Olson
Represented By: Donald E. Loudner, III
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. Olson, II
Represented By: Donald E. Loudner, III
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?