Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association v. South Sioux City
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association
Defendant: South Sioux City
Case Number: 8:2020cv00359
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant South Sioux City #13 by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City.(Tugan, Andrew)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to November 9, 2020, to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #13 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to File by Attorney Brian J. Brislen on behalf of Plaintiff Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association.(Brislen, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Seal. Access to Exhibit 4 at Filing No. #16 shall be restricted to the parties and the court, not sealed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT.(Tugan, Andrew) Modified on 9/29/2020 to restrict per #17 Text Order(LAC).
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to file under Seal by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City.(Tugan, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant South Sioux City #13 by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Lance Hedquist)(Tugan, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant South Sioux City by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City.(Tugan, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael P. Schmiedt and David C. Briese by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City (Tugan, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Brian J. Koenig and Andrew S. Tugan by Attorney Andrew Tugan on behalf of Defendant South Sioux City (Tugan, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to the unexpected and untimely death of Senior U.S. District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, this case is reassigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. The assigned magistrate judge remains the same for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard.(DKM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant South Sioux City on 9/8/2020. (Brislen, Brian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant South Sioux City. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent WFC Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association. by Attorney Brian J. Brislen on behalf of Plaintiffs Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, WFC Holdings, LLC, Wells Fargo & Company.(Brislen, Brian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to South Sioux City, Nebraska regarding Complaint, #1 . (Brislen, Brian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Brislen, Brian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Brislen, Brian)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Sioux City, City of ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4231637), by Attorney Brian J. Brislen on behalf of Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association, f/k/a Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association, as Collateral Trustee(Brislen, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association v. South Sioux City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Trust Company, National Association
Represented By: Adam R. Feeney
Represented By: Brian J. Brislen
Represented By: David A. Changstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, National Association
Represented By: Adam R. Feeney
Represented By: Brian J. Brislen
Represented By: David A. Changstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sioux City
Represented By: Brian J. Koenig
Represented By: Michael P. Schmiedt
Represented By: David C. Briese
Represented By: Andrew Tugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?