Bird Dog Capital, LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bird Dog Capital, LLC
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company and Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies
Case Number: 8:2020cv00364
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies (Greene, Earl)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Defendants' Privilege Log by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies (Greene, Earl)
November 5, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Defendants' Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies.(Greene, Earl)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Bird Dog Capital, LLC (Saathoff, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #12 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 7/30/2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. Status Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Bird Dog Capital, LLC.(Saathoff, Matthew)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies (Greene, Earl)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/22/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies (Greene, Earl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Bird Dog Capital, LLC.(Saathoff, Matthew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Amguard Insurance Company. by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies, Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Inc..(Greene, Earl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Amguard Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Bird Dog Capital, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Bird Dog Capital, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-6016 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4234490) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Amguard Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Greene, Earl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird Dog Capital, LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amguard Insurance Company
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Represented By: Mandy M. Gruhlkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Guard Insurance Companies
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Represented By: Mandy M. Gruhlkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bird Dog Capital, LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?