Gonzalez Martinez v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: Juan Gonzalez Martinez
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2020cv00372
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESTRICTED CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Petitioner Juan Gonzalez Martinez. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER on behalf of Petitioner Juan Gonzalez Martinez. (Attachments: #1 English Translation) (LKO)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Juan Gonzalez Martinez. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Lincoln County Jail. (LKO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Deputy Clerk that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 has been filed and is considered deficient because the document is not signed. The plaintiff shall correct the deficiency within 15 days of the date of this entry or the pleading may be stricken from the record of this case. See NECivR 11.1. (LKO) Satisfied on 9/28/2020 (LKO).
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Juan Gonzalez Martinez. (LKO)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Juan Gonzalez Martinez. (LKO) (Modified on 9/28/2020 to add document with signature: #1 Signature) (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Martinez v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Gonzalez Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?