Hyland v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Hyland
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC and Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP doing business as Rausch Sturm
Case Number: 8:2020cv00380
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
November 8, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Asset Management, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Newburger, Manuel)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 9, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Manuel H. Newburger on behalf of Defendants Crown Asset Management, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order extending answer date)(Newburger, Manuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Manuel H. Newburger on behalf of Defendants Crown Asset Management, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP.(Newburger, Manuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Manuel H. Newburger on behalf of Defendants Crown Asset Management, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP (Newburger, Manuel)
October 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP on 9/29/2020. (Car, Pamela)
October 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC on 9/28/2020. (Car, Pamela)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC, Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Crown Asset Management LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4241347), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Amanda Hyland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A- E)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyland v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Manuel H. Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Emerson & Hornick, LLP doing business as Rausch Sturm
Represented By: Manuel H. Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?