Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association v. Sebade et al
Plaintiff: Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association
Defendant: Rick Sebade, Swift Beef Company and Rick Sebade individually and d/b/a Sebade Feed Yards doing business as Sebade Feed Yards
Case Number: 8:2020cv00398
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Rick Sebade (Domina, David)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Service by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Rick Sebade (Domina, David)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
November 10, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Swift Beef Company (Niemeier, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent JBS S.A., Corporate Parent JBS USA Food Company, Other Affiliate JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Other Affiliate JBS Luxembourg S.a'r.l for Swift Beef Company. by Attorney James J. Niemeier on behalf of Defendants Swift Beef Company, JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings, JBS Luxembourg S.a'r.l, JBS S.A..(Niemeier, James)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Swift Beef Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant Rick Sebade's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Rick Sebade (Domina, David)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Swift Beef Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 12, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney James J. Niemeier on behalf of Defendant Swift Beef Company.(Niemeier, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James J. Niemeier on behalf of Defendant Swift Beef Company (Niemeier, James)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Rick Sebade shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 9, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Rick Sebade.(Domina, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendant Rick Sebade.(Domina, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association.(Robak, Erin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Swift Beef Company on 10/6/2020. (Robak, Erin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rick Sebade on 10/6/2020. (Robak, Erin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Rick Sebade and Swift Beef Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Robak, Erin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Rick Sebade regarding Complaint #1 . (Robak, Erin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4250954), by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association(Robak, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association v. Sebade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sebade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Represented By: James J. Niemeier
Represented By: Matthew G. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Sebade individually and d/b/a Sebade Feed Yards doing business as Sebade Feed Yards
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Kentucky Agricultural Credit Association
Represented By: Erin R. Robak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?