Gutherless v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Katie Gutherless
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00442
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is August 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER approving #18 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Gina M. Rossi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4296931 by Attorney Gina M. Rossi on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Rossi, Gina)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gina M. Rossi has not registered for admittance to practice, or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JAB)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Brian J. Urankar. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4292350 by Attorney Brian J. Urankar on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Urankar, Brian)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephonic planning conference is set for December 4, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge to discuss case progression. The parties shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (Filing No. #10 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Goman, Keith)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/23/2020. (LeNeave, Randal)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (LeNeave, Randal)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4262614), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Katie Gutherless (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutherless v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Gina M. Rossi
Represented By: Brian J. Urankar
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Gutherless
Represented By: Jayson D. Nelson
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?