Faith Regional Health Services v. Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Faith Regional Health Services
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00444
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.. by Attorney John J. Westerhaus on behalf of Defendants Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Cross Defendants Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc..(Westerhaus, John)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. (Westerhaus, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - This matter is before the Court on the Court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 18, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Todd C. Kinney on behalf of Defendant Ironshore Indemnity, Inc..(Kinney, Todd)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for UMR, Inc.. by Attorney Kacie Phillips on behalf of Defendants UMR, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated.(Phillips, Kacie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 filed by Faith Regional Health Services by UMR, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips, Kacie)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant UMR, Inc. on 10/26/2020. (Davidson, Steven)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. on 10/28/2020. (Davidson, Steven)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. and UMR, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to UMR, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Davidson, Steven)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Davidson, Steven)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ironshore Indemnity, Inc., UMR, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4263391), by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Faith Regional Health Services(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith Regional Health Services v. Ironshore Indemnity, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Regional Health Services
Represented By: Nicholas F. Miller
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Westerhaus
Represented By: Todd C. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Kacie Phillips
Represented By: Kadee J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?