Payne v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia E. Payne
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00467
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Rule 26(A)(1) by Attorney Bradley D. Holtorf on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia E. Payne.(Holtorf, Bradley)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney Michael J. Roccaforte on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Stipulated Protective Order)(Roccaforte, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is November 1, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on November 1, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties voluntarily consent to reassignment to the referral magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(i) case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (MLF)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michael J. Roccaforte on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Roccaforte, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael J. Roccaforte on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Roccaforte, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc. (Roccaforte, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Walmart Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Patricia E. Payne from District Court of Dodge County, Case number CI 20-530 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4274691) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael J. Roccaforte on behalf of Walmart, Inc.(Roccaforte, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau
Represented By: Michael J. Roccaforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Heidi A. Guttau
Represented By: Michael J. Roccaforte
Represented By: George E. Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia E. Payne
Represented By: Linsey M. Bryant
Represented By: Bradley D. Holtorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?