Omaha Public Power District v. MP Nexlevel, LLC
Plaintiff: Omaha Public Power District
Defendant: MP Nexlevel, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00536
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due December 17, 2021. Status Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing no. #6 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Discovery Requests by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant MP Nexlevel, LLC (Rauterkus, Jerald)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Steven R. Hogan, II on behalf of Plaintiff Omaha Public Power District.(Hogan, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Steven R. Hogan, II on behalf of Plaintiff Omaha Public Power District (Hogan, Steven)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Steven R. Hogan, II on behalf of Plaintiff Omaha Public Power District.(Hogan, Steven)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant MP Nexlevel, LLC (Rauterkus, Jerald)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew D. Quandt on behalf of Defendant MP Nexlevel, LLC (Quandt, Matthew)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/8/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent API Group, Inc. for MP Nexlevel, LLC. by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendants MP Nexlevel, LLC, API Group, Inc..(Rauterkus, Jerald)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by MP Nexlevel, LLC (Rauterkus, Jerald)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant MP Nexlevel, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against MP Nexlevel, LLC from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI 20-9472 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4306886) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of MP Nexlevel, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rauterkus, Jerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omaha Public Power District v. MP Nexlevel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Public Power District
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Represented By: Steven R. Hogan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Nexlevel, LLC
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Represented By: Matthew D. Quandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?