Poke v. American Laboratories LLC
Plaintiff: Antione Poke
Defendant: American Laboratories LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00009
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Defendant American Laboratories LLC (Clark, Aaron)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due December 3, 2021. Planning Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate by Attorney Joseph D. Hall on behalf of Plaintiff Antione Poke.(Hall, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Cody E. Brookhouser on behalf of Defendant American Laboratories LLC.(Brookhouser, Cody)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent ALI Holdings, LLC for American Laboratories LLC. by Attorney Cody E. Brookhouser on behalf of Defendants American Laboratories LLC, ALI Holdings, LLC.(Brookhouser, Cody)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/18/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by American Laboratories LLC (Brookhouser, Cody)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant American Laboratories LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Antione Poke from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-9370 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4311996) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Cody E. Brookhouser on behalf of American Laboratories LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Brookhouser, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poke v. American Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Represented By: Cody E. Brookhouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antione Poke
Represented By: Joseph D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?