Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Molly R. Stacey et al
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Austin J. Stacey, Mark A. Meyer, Courtney R. Stacey, Estate of Molly R. Stacey and Steven Greg Meyer
Case Number: 8:2021cv00015
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Minnesota Life Insurance Company regarding Complaint, #1 filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company by Courtney R. Stacey, Estate of Molly R. Stacey, Austin J. Stacey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P, #5 Exhibit Q, #6 Exhibit R, #7 Exhibit S, #8 Exhibit T, #9 Exhibit U, #10 Exhibit V) (White, Thomas)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Attorney Ronald Reagan for defendant Estate of Molly R. Stacey. Waiver sent on 1/12/2021. (Skilton, Kathryn)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Attorney Ronald Reagan for defendant Austin J. Stacey. Waiver sent on 1/12/2021. (Skilton, Kathryn)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Attorney Ronald Reagan for defendant Courtney R. Stacey. Waiver sent on 1/12/2021. (Skilton, Kathryn)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Securian Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Securian Holding Company, Corporate Parent Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc. for Minnesota Life Insurance Company. by Attorney Kathryn M. Skilton on behalf of Plaintiffs Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc., Securian Holding Company, Minnesota Mutual Companies, Inc..(Skilton, Kathryn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Attorney Travis Jacott for defendant Mark A. Meyer. Waiver sent on 1/12/2021. (Skilton, Kathryn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Attorney Travis Jacott for defendant Steven Greg Meyer. Waiver sent on 1/12/2021. (Skilton, Kathryn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kathryn M. Skilton on behalf of Plaintiff Minnesota Life Insurance Company (Skilton, Kathryn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Defendant Steven Greg Meyer. (Jacott, Travis) Modified on 1/22/2021 to reflect executed (LKO).
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Defendant Mark A. Meyer. (Jacott, Travis) Modified on 1/22/2021 to reflect executed (LKO).
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kathryn M. Skilton has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Minnesota Life Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Interpleader Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4314964), by Attorney Jesse J. E. Linebaugh on behalf of Minnesota Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Linebaugh, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Life Insurance Company v. Estate of Molly R. Stacey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin J. Stacey
Represented By: Ronald E. Reagan
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Meyer
Represented By: Travis M. Jacott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney R. Stacey
Represented By: Ronald E. Reagan
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Molly R. Stacey
Represented By: Ronald E. Reagan
Represented By: Thomas M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Greg Meyer
Represented By: Travis M. Jacott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse J. E. Linebaugh
Represented By: Kathryn M. Skilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?