Sundell v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Constance Sundell
Defendant: Alcon Research, LLC, Alcon Research, LTD., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited and Novartis Pharma AG
Case Number: 8:2021cv00032
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation on 3/4/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - CONSENT - Consent Deadline set for 4/9/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
March 9, 2021 Filing 27 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #26 by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER approving #23 Stipulation for Dismissal. Defendants Novartis AG, Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited, and Alcon Research, LLC, f/k/a Alcon Research, Ltd., are dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 9, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Corporate Parent Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss Company, Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the Six Swiss Exchange, and for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Finance Corporation, a New York Corporation, Novartis Corporation, a New York corporation, Novartis Holding, AG, a Swiss Company, Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the Six Swiss Exchange, and.(Huffer, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited.(Huffer, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Carter F. Thurman on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Thurman, Carter)
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Robert Johnston on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Johnston, Robert)
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Shannon N. Proctor on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Proctor, Shannon)
March 5, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Alcon Research, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants, Alcon Research, LLC, and Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., shall have an extension to March 9, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Requested as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Bogle, Brandon)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc..(Huffer, Michael)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. (Krause, Ronald)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kathryn J. Cheatle on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. (Cheatle, Kathryn)
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #9 for attorney Matthew Malinowski. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4340167 by Attorney Matthew Malinowski on behalf of Defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Ag, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., Novartis Pharma AG, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited.(Malinowski, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. on 2/11/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Alcon Research, LLC on 2/11/2021. (Bogle, Brandon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Alcon Research, LLC, Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc., and Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Alcon Research, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Bogle, Brandon)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4325342), by Attorney Brandon Bogle on behalf of Constance Sundell(Bogle, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundell v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Research, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Research, LTD.
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Ag
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Institutes for Biomedical Research, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Robert Johnston
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Represented By: Shannon N. Proctor
Represented By: Carter F. Thurman
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharma AG
Represented By: Matthew Malinowski
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Sundell
Represented By: Brandon Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?