Kimbrough v. Gorham et al
Plaintiff: Kacey Kimbrough
Defendant: Spencer R. Jennings, Jennings Plant Services, LLC, Christopher James Gorham, Tarin K. Jennings and Hope Cooperative Care, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00035
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Kacey Kimbrough(Buchanan, Andrew)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 for attorney Walter E. Williams. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4329587 by Attorney Walter E Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Kacey Kimbrough.(Williams, Walter)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Christopher James Gorham, Spencer R. Jennings, Tarin K. Jennings and Jennings Plant Services, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Walter E. Williams has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Christopher James Gorham, Jennings Plant Services, LLC, Spencer R. Jennings, Tarin K. Jennings regarding Complaint, #1 . (Buchanan, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4327675), by Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Kacey Kimbrough (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Buchanan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbrough v. Gorham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer R. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Plant Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher James Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarin K. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Cooperative Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacey Kimbrough
Represented By: Walter E Williams
Represented By: Andrew S. Buchanan
Represented By: James V. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?