Alvarez v. Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Alvarez
Defendant: Brenda Brooks, Hope Homles, Dennis Obrian and Health and Human Services
Case Number: 8:2021cv00038
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's Memorandum and Order filed on March 24, 2021 (Filing #8 ), is vacated. Plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel (Filing #3 ) and for issuance of summons (Filing #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff is warned that an amended complaint will supersede, not supplement, her prior pleadings. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) in the event she files an amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: April 26, 2021 amended complaint due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 *VACATED* MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel (Filing #3 ) and for issuance of summons (Filing #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff is warned that an amended complaint will supersede, not supplement, her prior pleadings. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) in the event she files an amended complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: April 23, 2021 amended complaint due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of her current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) Modified on 3/25/2021 to vacate per Order #9 (LKO).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in her case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of her claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Sheila Alvarez. (LKO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Sheila Alvarez. (LKO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Sheila Alvarez. (LKO)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Brenda Brooks, Health and Human Services, Hope Homles, and Dennis Obrian filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Sheila Alvarez. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Homles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Obrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?