Nation v. Frakes
Petitioner: Jeremiah Y. Nation
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2021cv00057
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - that Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time (Filing #10 ) is granted. Respondent's motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of answer shall be filed on or before May 5, 2021. The remainder of the deadlines are set forth in Filing #8 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stacy M. Foust on behalf of Respondent Scott Frakes.(Foust, Stacy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stacy M. Foust on behalf of Respondent Scott Frakes (Foust, Stacy)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing #1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioners claims, as they are set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. By April 5, 2021, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 5, 2021: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 5, 2021: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing #3 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Service on behalf of Petitioner Jeremiah Y. Nation. (LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Jeremiah Y. Nation. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Jeremiah Y. Nation. (LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Jeremiah Y. Nation. (LKO)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Jeremiah Y. Nation. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nation v. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremiah Y. Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?