Ekeler et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency
Plaintiff: Christopher Ekeler and Shelley Ekeler
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Case Number: 8:2021cv00065
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United States Attorney General on behalf of defendant Federal Emergency Management Agency on 3/12/2021. (Eichmann, Justin)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Jennifer Price. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4355238 by Attorney Jennifer Price on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher Ekeler, Shelley Ekeler.(Price, Jennifer)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon United States Attorney District of Nebraska on behalf of defendant Federal Emergency Management Agency on 3/5/2021. (Eichmann, Justin)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Federal Emergency Management Agency regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Federal Emergency Management Agency (Attorney General) regarding Complaint #1 . (Eichmann, Justin)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Federal Emergency Management Agency (US Attorney) regarding Complaint #1 . (Eichmann, Justin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Federal Emergency Management Agency ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4342042), by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Christopher Ekeler, Shelley Ekeler(Eichmann, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekeler et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ekeler
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: Jennifer Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Ekeler
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: Jennifer Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?