Becker v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Susanne Becker and Susanne R. Hurd
Defendant: State of Nebraska, State of Texas, United States of America, Nebraska Department of Human Health Services, Ken Paxon and Dannette Smith
Case Number: 8:2021cv00075
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 4/23/2021 to correct motion type per MDN chambers (LKO).
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Serve Defendant United States #11 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION Rule5(d) does not forfeit on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for an Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision , MOTION I served NE and TX () on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit did serve U.S.A)(Hurd, Susanne)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Serve Defendant United States #11 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Serve Defendant United States #11 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wagner, Lynnett)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Serve Defendant United States by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The United States of America shall have an extension of time to April 16, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Supplement Complaint. See NECivR. 15.1(b); Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(d). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION add to the complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hurd, Susanne)
March 2, 2021 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGEn e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Susanne Becker (also known as Susanne R. Hurd) received. Access granted on 3/2/21. Plaintiff's name was modified on this case to match the name on her PACER account. The plaintiff's name on the docket sheet now reflects Susanne R. Hurd with an alias of Susanne Becker. (JLS) Modified on 3/2/2021 (JLS).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The United States of America shall have an extension of time to April 2, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States of America.(Wagner, Lynnett)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Susanne Becker from In the District Court of Scotts Bluff County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-676 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Complaint)(Wagner, Lynnett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Human Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dannette Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne R. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?