Lightfeather v. M.G.M. Studios et al
Plaintiff: Austin Edward Lightfeather
Defendant: Nicolas Cage, Title Wind Talkers and M.G.M. Studios
Case Number: 8:2021cv00083
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT Pursuant to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Filing #10 ), filed prior to service of summons, this case is dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated1 civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (LRM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for status on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather (LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather.(LRM)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LRM)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's "Motions 1) File to Waive Leave of In Forma Pauperis and 2) File to Waive Filing Fee" construed as a request to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing #1 , Part 2), is denied without prejudice to reassertion in a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $402.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: April 7, 2021: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(CS)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (ADB)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicolas Cage, M.G.M. Studios, Title Wind Talkers; no Summons(es) issued ; filed on behalf of plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. PART 1 OF 2 PARTS.(ADB)
March 3, 2021 PART 2 OF 2 PARTS regarding Complaint #1 - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Austin Edward Lightfeather. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightfeather v. M.G.M. Studios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Edward Lightfeather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Cage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Wind Talkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G.M. Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?