Sutton v. USA Government
Plaintiff: Zacharyn Sutton
Defendant: USA Government
Case Number: 8:2021cv00106
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - JUDGMENT IS ENTERED providing that this case is dismissed without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LRM) Modified on 3/23/2021 to reflect that a paper copy was not mailed to the pro se plaintiff as he receives electronic notice (LRM).
March 18, 2021 Remark - Public: CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Zacharyn Sutton received. Access granted on 3/18/21. (JLS)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Zacharyn Sutton.(LAC)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against USA Government filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Zacharyn Sutton.(LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. USA Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zacharyn Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?