Ward v. Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc., Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Ward
Defendant: Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00113
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 22 Certificate of Service (Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc..(Ahl, Stephen)
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Service (Mandatory Disclosures) by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc..(Ahl, Stephen)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Intention to Serve Rule 33 Records Subpoena by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc. (Ahl, Stephen)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on December 28, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #15 .) Depositions due 03/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRM)
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 STATEMENT Proposed Trial Scheduling & Discovery Plan by Attorney Pete Leehey on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Ward.(Leehey, Pete)
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Attorney Pete Leehey on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Ward (Leehey, Pete)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/6/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRM)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kevin Reynolds is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc. (Ahl, Stephen)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Kevin M. Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc. (LRM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kevin M. Reynolds has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00056. Original electronic file received.
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 3/15/2021. (nlh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc.. (Reynolds, Kevin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Robert Ward. Replies due by 3/18/2021.(Leehey, Peter) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue by Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Reynolds, Kevin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc..(Reynolds, Kevin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/15/2021. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Errata Correcting Federal Court Number re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Roadbuilders Machinery and Supply Co., Inc.. (Reynolds, Kevin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roadbuilders Machinery and Supply Co., Inc. from In the Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL149740. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4403941., filed by Roadbuilders Machinery and Supply Co., Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings Filed in LACL149740, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Kevin) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 3/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Builders Machinery & Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ward
Represented By: Pete Leehey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?