Elliott v. AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Andrew Elliott
Defendant: AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv00136
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Elliott (Parr, James)
May 13, 2021 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (LKO)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Elliott (Parr, James)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation on 4/2/2021. (Parr, James)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation regarding Complaint #1 . (Parr, James)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4369032), by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Andrew Elliott(Parr, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Elliott
Represented By: James J. Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?