The Benefit Group et al v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Benefit Group, Linus G. Humpl and Linus G. Humpal
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00155
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #14 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on February 8, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is April 1, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
June 3, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Timothy J. Thalken on behalf of Plaintiffs Linus G. Humpal, The Benefit Group.(Thalken, Timothy)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Jones, Leland)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Greene, Earl)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Leland H. Jones, IV. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4381678 by Attorney Leland H. Jones, IV on behalf of Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Jones, Leland)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Timothy J. Thalken on behalf of Plaintiffs The Benefit Group, Linus G. Humpal.(Thalken, Timothy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Defendants Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Greene, Earl)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff The Benefit Group. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21-2615 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4380068) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Earl G. Greene, III on behalf of Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Greene, Earl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Benefit Group et al v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Benefit Group
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linus G. Humpl
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linus G. Humpal
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: Leland H. Jones, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?