Pauly v. UNIFIN, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristy K. Pauly
Defendant: Oliver Wright & Associates, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. and UNIFIN, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00156
Filed: April 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Resurgent Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Alegis Group LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendants Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Holdings LLC, Alegis Group LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Dickinson, Joshua)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Oliver Wright & Associates on 4/30/2021. (Car, Pamela)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. on 4/23/2021. (Car, Pamela)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant UNIFIN, Inc. on 4/23/2021. (Car, Pamela)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Oliver Wright & Associates. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. and UNIFIN, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Resurgent Capital Servicies LP regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to UNIFIN, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4380344), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Kristy K. Pauly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. Wright Letter)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauly v. UNIFIN, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy K. Pauly
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Wright & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIFIN, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?