Midland Resources, LLC v. Iowa Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Midland Resources, LLC
Defendant: Iowa Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00178
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #12 by Iowa Mutual Insurance Company (Puk, Jon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Jennifer Price. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4415758 by Attorney Jennifer Price on behalf of Plaintiff Midland Resources, LLC.(Price, Jennifer)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint #12 , the motion to dismiss is moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Iowa Mutual Insurance Company, by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Midland Resources, LLC(Eichmann, Justin)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for final disposition. (LKO)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before June 7, 2021, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" form located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. ( Consent Deadline set for 6/7/2021) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Encova Insurance, Corporate Parent Encova Insurance for Iowa Mutual Insurance Company. by Attorney Jon J. Puk on behalf of Defendants Iowa Mutual Insurance Company, Encova Insurance, Encova Insurance.(Puk, Jon)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Jon J. Puk on behalf of Defendant Iowa Mutual Insurance Company.(Puk, Jon)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Iowa Mutual Insurance Company on 5/3/2021. (Eichmann, Justin)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff Midland Resources, LLC.(Eichmann, Justin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Midland Resources, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Iowa Mutual Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Iowa Mutual Insurance Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Eichmann, Justin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Iowa Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4390139), by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Midlands Resources, LLC(Eichmann, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland Resources, LLC v. Iowa Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jon J. Puk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland Resources, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Represented By: Jennifer Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?