Hartman v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Loriel Hartman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security, Andrew M. Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2021cv00196
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file the administrative record and an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 21, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) Modified on 7/22/2021 (LRH).
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 INDEX in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and the Administrative Transcript #11 by Attorney Steven A. Russell on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Russell, Steven)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading and the Administrative Transcript by Attorney Steven A. Russell on behalf of Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Russell, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Party. Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, is substituted for Andrew M. Saul as the defendant in this suit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Steven A. Russell on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul.(Russell, Steven)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (1-Social Security Administration, 1- U.S. Attorney General, 1- U.S. Attorney). YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MKR)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security regarding Complaint #3 . (Kappelman, Wes)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4403627), by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Loriel Hartman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kappelman, Wes)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Strike Complaint #1 wrong pdf had been filed by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Plaintiff Loriel Hartman.(Kappelman, Wes)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 STRICKEN-COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4403557), by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Loriel Hartman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kappelman, Wes) Modified on 5/24/2021 strike per Order (MKR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Steven A. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Steven A. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loriel Hartman
Represented By: Kimberly F. Schram
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?