Holloway v. Held Records of DMV et al
Plaintiff: Walter H. Holloway
Defendant: The Driver Attorney/Lawyer Micheal Dowd of Corrigan Dowd Law Firm and Held Records of DMV
Case Number: 8:2021cv00207
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Walter H. Holloway. (LKO)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Walter H. Holloway. (LKO)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Walter H. Holloway at P.O. Box 11739, 3030 Meredith Street, Omaha, NE 68111 regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 and Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01 #4 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Walter H. Holloway. (LKO)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Held Records of DMV and The Driver Attorney/Lawyer Micheal Dowd of Corrigan Dowd Law Firm filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Walter H. Holloway. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Held Records of DMV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Driver Attorney/Lawyer Micheal Dowd of Corrigan Dowd Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Held Records of DMV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter H. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?