DeLanie v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carol L DeLanie
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00247
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is July 1, 2022. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on July 1, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 13, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) by Attorney Matthew G. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Carol L DeLanie (Miller, Matthew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/13/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Order - Text Only, 6 is stricken for the following reason(s): document filed in incorrect case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN - TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Memorandum and Order 46 the next joint status report regarding the progress of arbitration proceedings is due by October 12, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM) Modified on 7/13/2021 to strike per order 7 (ADB).
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Order - Text Only 4 is stricken for the following reason(s): document filed in incorrect case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STRICKEN - TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's Memorandum and Order 46 the next joint status report regarding the progress of arbitration proceedings is due by October 12, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM) Modified on 7/13/2021 to strike per order 5 (ADB).
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LAC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Carol L DeLanie from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI21-5952 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4430331) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Roper, #3 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeLanie v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L DeLanie
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?