Westjohn v. Seldin Co.
Plaintiff: Karla Ann Westjohn
Defendant: Seldin Co.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00252
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and is assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #7 by Attorney Julie A. Jorgensen on behalf of Defendant Seldin Co..(Jorgensen, Julie)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Julie A. Jorgensen on behalf of Defendant Seldin Co..(Jorgensen, Julie)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Seldin Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - Upon the request of Plaintiff's counsel, the Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's completed summons request, issue summons, and return it to Plaintiff's counsel via email for service. The Clerk of Court is also directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's counsel at the address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Seldin Co. regarding Complaint #1 . (LKO)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seldin Co. with receipt number 8060808, in the amount of $402 filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Karla Ann Westjohn. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westjohn v. Seldin Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Ann Westjohn
Represented By: Karla A. Westjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seldin Co.
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?