Bakken Contracting, LLC v. The Venue at Werner Park, LLC
Plaintiff: Bakken Contracting, LLC doing business as BC Contracting
Defendant: The Venue at Werner Park, LLC
Counter Defendant: Bakken Contracting, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Western Surety Company, Sean Negus Construction, LLC doing business as SNC Contractors, R2 Plumbing, LLC, Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc. doing business as Cherry Valley Concrete and Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Sean Negus Construction, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00269
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 78 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Sean Negus Construction by Bakken Contracting, LLC (Ketcham, Dan)
August 22, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC (Ketcham, Dan)
August 22, 2022 Filing 76 ANSWER to Crossclaim of Sean Negus Construction by Western Surety Company (Robak, Erin)
August 10, 2022 Filing 75 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing regarding Order on Motion to Amend #74 . Status Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SECOND AMENDEDFINAL PROGRESSION ORDER granting #73 Motion to Amend. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. The status conference presently scheduled for January 12, 2023 is canceled. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on July 13, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. 27.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
August 9, 2022 Filing 73 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Progression Schedule by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
August 1, 2022 Filing 72 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Bakken Contracting, LLC, CROSSCLAIM of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC against Western Surety Company, COUNTERCLAIM of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC against Bakken Contracting, LLC by Sean Negus Construction, LLC (Young, Duncan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT SNC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(1)- The Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by Third-Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC, (SNC) is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (MKR)
July 18, 2022 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Third Party Defendant Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc..(Tjaden, Christopher)
July 15, 2022 Filing 69 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Third Party Defendant Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
July 14, 2022 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc. (Tjaden, Christopher)
June 28, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christopher J. Tjaden on behalf of Third Party Defendant Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc. (Tjaden, Christopher)
June 24, 2022 Filing 66 Third Party Defendant's ANSWER to Crossclaim of R2 Plumbing LLC by Western Surety Company (Robak, Erin)
June 24, 2022 Filing 65 Third Party Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of R2 Plumbing LLC by Bakken Contracting, LLC (Robak, Erin)
June 20, 2022 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jennifer D. Tricker on behalf of Third Party Defendant Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc..(Tricker, Jennifer)
June 7, 2022 Filing 63 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) #56 of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
June 7, 2022 Filing 62 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) #56 by Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Contruction by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Robak Declaration, #2 Ex A-1 to Robak Declaration, #3 Ex A-2 to Robak Declaration)(Robak, Erin)
June 7, 2022 Filing 61 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Third Party Defendant Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
June 6, 2022 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc. (Tricker, Jennifer)
June 3, 2022 Filing 59 R2 Plumbing, LLC ANSWER to Complaint 3rd Party Plaintiff - Bakken Contracting LLC, CROSSCLAIM of 3rd Party Def - R2 Plumbing, LLC against Western Surety Company regarding Third Party Complaint, #45 filed by Bakken Contracting, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM 3rd Party Def - R2 Plumbing LLC against Bakken Contracting, LLC regarding Third Party Complaint, #45 filed by Bakken Contracting, LLC by R2 Plumbing, LLC (Kaup, Denise)
May 17, 2022 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Duncan A. Young on behalf of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC.(Young, Duncan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 57 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) #56 by Attorney Duncan A. Young on behalf of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, A, B, C, D, E)(Young, Duncan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) by Attorney Duncan A. Young on behalf of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC.(Young, Duncan)
May 12, 2022 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Denise L. Kaup on behalf of Third Party Defendant R2 Plumbing, LLC.(Kaup, Denise)
May 11, 2022 Filing 54 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
May 11, 2022 Filing 53 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Third Party Defendant R2 Plumbing, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance Acceptance of Service by Attorney Duncan A. Young on behalf of Third Party Defendant Sean Negus Construction, LLC (Young, Duncan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc. on 5/2/2022. (Robak, Erin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc. on 5/2/2022. (Robak, Erin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 49 Acceptance of Service on May 5, 2022 upon R-2 Plumbing, LLC by Attorney Denise L. Kaup on behalf of Third Party Defendant R2 Plumbing, LLC.(Kaup, Denise) Modified on 5/11/2022 to correct description of filing (TJM).
April 28, 2022 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to defendant Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc., Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
April 28, 2022 Filing 47 Summons Requested as to Grand Rapids Poured Walls Inc regarding Third Party Complaint, #45 . (Robak, Erin)
April 28, 2022 Filing 46 Summons Requested as to Mahoney Fire Sprinkler Inc regarding Third Party Complaint, #45 . (Robak, Erin)
April 20, 2022 Filing 45 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sean Negus Construction, LLC, R2 Plumbing, LLC, Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc., Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc., by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Bakken Contracting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - SNC Subcontract, #2 Ex. B - R2 Plumbing Subcontract, #3 Ex. C - Cherry Valley Subcontracct, #4 Ex. D - Mahoney Sprinkler Subcontract)(Robak, Erin)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Unopposed Motion for Leave. Bakken Contracting shall file its Third Party Complaint by April 20, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 18, 2022 Filing 43 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Third Party Complaint)(Robak, Erin)
March 30, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Houghton, David)
March 16, 2022 Filing 41 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing regarding Final Progression Order #40 . Status Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due January 16, 2023. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Amended Stipulation to Enter Amended Progression Schedule. #39 . The motion is granted. The parties' Joint Stipulation to Amend Case Progression Order #38 is denied as moot. Status Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
March 16, 2022 Filing 39 AMENDED STIPULATION to Enter Amended Progression Schedule by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC, Third Party Defendant Western Surety Company.(Robak, Erin)
March 14, 2022 Filing 38 JOINT STIPULATION to Amend Case Progression Order by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
February 22, 2022 Filing 37 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
December 2, 2021 Filing 36 Certificate of Service of Third Party Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Third Party Defendant Western Surety Company.(Robak, Erin)
December 2, 2021 Filing 35 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Serving Initial Disclosures by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Houghton, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due October 17, 2022. Status Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 02:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
November 18, 2021 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
November 17, 2021 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion to Extend. The mandatory disclosure deadline is extended to December 1, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
November 17, 2021 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Initial Disclosures Deadline Scheduling Order #26 by Attorney Aimee C. Bataillon on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff The Venue at Werner Park, LLC, Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC.(Bataillon, Aimee)
November 17, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Aimee C. Bataillon on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff The Venue at Werner Park, LLC, Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Bataillon, Aimee)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/17/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
October 14, 2021 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Third Party Defendant Western Surety Company.(Robak, Erin)
October 7, 2021 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Third Party Defendant Western Surety Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
October 6, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Western Surety Company (Robak, Erin)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Western Surety Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third-Party Complaint by October 8, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 24, 2021 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Third Party Defendant Western Surety Company.(Robak, Erin)
September 22, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant, Doc No. 8 by Bakken Contracting, LLC (Robak, Erin)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #18 for attorney Mark R. Hanson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Hanson Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4477911 by Attorney Mark R. Hanson on behalf of Counter Defendant Bakken Contracting, LLC, Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Hanson, Mark)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff The Venue at Werner Park, LLC.(Houghton, David)
September 13, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Third -Party defendant Western Surety Company on 9/7/2021. (Houghton, David)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to third-party defendant Western Surety Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to Western Surety Company regarding Third Party Complaint #10 . (Houghton, David)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Western Surety Company regarding Third Party Complaint #10 . (Houghton, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Western Surety Company regarding Third Party Complaint #10 . (Houghton, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Western Surety Company, by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Performance Bond)(Houghton, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC, Counter Claimant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Houghton, David)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bakken Contracting, LLC regarding Complaint #1 filed by Bakken Contracting, LLC by The Venue at Werner Park, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Performance Bond) (Houghton, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC.(Robak, Erin)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC on 7/28/2021. (Robak, Erin)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Bakken Contracting, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant The Venue at Werner Park, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Robak, Erin)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against The Venue at Werner Park, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4439215), by Attorney Erin R. Robak on behalf of Bakken Contracting, LLC dba BC Contracting(Robak, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakken Contracting, LLC v. The Venue at Werner Park, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bakken Contracting, LLC doing business as BC Contracting
Represented By: Erin R. Robak
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Robert L. Lepp
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Venue at Werner Park, LLC
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Represented By: Keith A. Harvat
Represented By: Aimee C. Bataillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bakken Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Erin R. Robak
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Represented By: Robert L. Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Erin R. Robak
Represented By: James D. Johnson
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Represented By: Robert L. Lepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sean Negus Construction, LLC doing business as SNC Contractors
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: R2 Plumbing, LLC
Represented By: Denise L. Kaup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Grand Rapids Poured Walls, Inc. doing business as Cherry Valley Concrete
Represented By: Brian Barmettler
Represented By: Jennifer D. Tricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mahoney Fire Sprinkler, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Tjaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Sean Negus Construction, LLC
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?