Manning v. Card.com
Plaintiff: John W. Manning
Defendant: Card.com
Case Number: 8:2021cv00274
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT - PRO SE- Pursuant to the court's Memorandum and Order filed this date, JUDGMENT IS ENTERED providing that this case is dismissed without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On August 5, 2021, the court ordered Plaintiff to update his address with the court within 30 days or face dismissal of this action. To date, Plaintiff has not updated his address or taken any other action in this matter. This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to John W. Manning regarding Memorandum and Order #7 . NOT REMAILED, NO FORWARDING ADDRESS. (MKR)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to John W. Manning regarding Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01, #4 , Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 and Memorandum and Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #5 . NOT REMAILED, NO FORWARDING ADDRESS. (MKR)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to John W. Manning regarding Memorandum and Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #5 . NOT REMAILED-NO FORWARDING ADDRESS (MKR)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/7/2021: check for address) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed as driected)(MKR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to 9555 Crofton, Houston, TX 77016 regarding Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01, #4 , Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #3 . Mail not re-mailed, no forwarding address. (MLF)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff John W. Manning. (MKR)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Card.com, no Summons issued, filed on behalf of Plaintiff John W. Manning. (Attachments: #1 2 copies received, but not exact copies of complaint #1 )(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Card.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Card.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?