ZO Skin Health, Inc. v. HBA & MFL Inc.
Plaintiff: ZO Skin Health, Inc.
Defendant: HBA & MFL Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00317
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED regarding Summons Issued #6 of Service by Attorney Jaynee M. Tyler on behalf of Plaintiff ZO Skin Health, Inc. (Tyler, Jaynee) Modified on 9/10/2021 to reflect that the document is a summons return per phone call from plaintiff's counsel (LRM).
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jaynee M. Tyler on behalf of Plaintiff ZO Skin Health, Inc..(Tyler, Jaynee)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant HBA & MFL Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark. Complaint filed on 08/19/2021. Notification sent to the U.S. Patent Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LRM)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff ZO Skin Health, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Tyler, Jaynee)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against HBA & MFL Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4459499), by Attorney Jaynee M. Tyler on behalf of ZO Skin Health, Inc.(Tyler, Jaynee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZO Skin Health, Inc. v. HBA & MFL Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZO Skin Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda K. Smith
Represented By: Jaynee M. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBA & MFL Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?