Blackmore v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: David E. Blackmore
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00318
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to compel access to the location of the accident for inspection by his retained expert, along with his resistance to the railroad's release requirements for granting such access, shall be filed on or before October 19, 2021, with Defendant's response due seven days thereafter. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 12, 2021 Filing 20 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 10/12/2021 1:02:06 PM ]. File Size [ 7590 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:31:37 ]. (Telephone Conference). (auto-docket).
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart on 10/12/2021. Telephonic Conference held regarding inspection of property. Plaintiff granted 1 week to decide if the matter will be litigated. If a motion is filed, defendant has 1 week to respond. Appearance for Plaintiff: Joshua N. Miller, retained; For Defendant: Gina M. Rossi. Courtroom Deputy: Jeri A. Bierbower. Reporter: Digital Recorder. Time Start: 1:02 PM; Time Stop: 1:33 PM; Time in Court: 31 Minutes. (JAB)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A Telephone Conference is set for October 12, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties shall send a concise description of the dispute to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov on or before October 11, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. The parties shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (Filing No. #9 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER approving #16 Stipulation Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Concerning Remote Deposition Procedures by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Plaintiff David E. Blackmore.(Banker, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Plaintiff David E. Blackmore.(Banker, Paul)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Gina M. Rossi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Paul Prezioso. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Miller by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Plaintiff David E. Blackmore (Banker, Paul)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4481899 by Attorney Gina M. Rossi on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Rossi, Gina)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4481316 by Attorney Paul Prezioso on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Prezioso, Paul)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/18/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Reha Dallon on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Dallon, Reha)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Dallon, Reha)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 8/23/2021. (Banker, Paul)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Union Pacific Railroad Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Banker, Paul)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4460858), by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of David E. Blackmore (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Banker, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackmore v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Blackmore
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Represented By: Joshua N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Gina M. Rossi
Represented By: Paul Prezioso
Represented By: Reha Dallon
Represented By: Torriano N. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?